U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1-25-41887
  • Case Name: Tri-Borough Home Care, LTD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Directing US Trustee to Appoint/Not Appoint Ombudsman]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule Hearing (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficient Filing Chapter 11]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Case Related to a Chapter 11]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.