U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10427-1
  • Case Name: Ricardo M. Lee Chee and Gabrielle D. Lee Chee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Amended Schedules/Mailing Matrix]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Hearing on Default Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Payment Advice Statements]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Update Ch 13 Deficiency Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Update Ch 13 Deficiency Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.