U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22330
  • Case Name: Tina Sohan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate Filed By Provider]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Notice, Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Auto - docket of credit card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [341(a) Notice (Chapter 13) (BNC)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Repeat Filer]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) (Form B2830)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) (Form B2830)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Frost, Thomas C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income - Form 122C-2]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income - Form 122C-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.