U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10428-1
  • Case Name: Gregory R. Liberatore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Hearing Set(Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Payment Advice Statements]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Affidavit]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [341 Telephonic Call-In Information]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Amended Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Mailing Matrix and/or Certification of Mailing Matrix]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Employ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Scheduling Order (BK)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Huebscher-Trustee, Eric [Update Ch 11 Deficiency Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Directing DIP Duties]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Reassignment of Judge]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Update Ch 11 Deficiency Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Attorney Use]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.