U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-mc-00248
  • Case Name: ONH Liquidating Trust v. ES 1 Westend Residence Trust et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Declaration in Support of Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service Other]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit of Service Other]
  • April 24, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Affidavit of Service Other]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.