U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter - Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Submission]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Submission]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Letter Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.