U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-00171
  • Case Name: Murie v. Botteri et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Court Regarding Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Cover Sheet]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Case Under Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Miscellaneous Cover Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Miscellaneous Pleading]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Case Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.