U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-09113
  • Case Name: Brown v. New York City Human Resources Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.