U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-03241
  • Case Name: Marsh USA LLC v. AON Risk Services Companies, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • April 17, 2025: [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.