U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PENA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Endorsed Letter]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2025: [Endorsed Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Filing Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Bond]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.