U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zarubina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Letter Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 30, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Letter Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.