U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Bond]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Transcript]
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memo Endorsement]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memo Endorsement]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Interest of Justice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to File Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.