U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-00191
  • Case Name: Sternberg v. Long Island Jewish Medical Center / Northwell Health Alliance, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Cover Sheet]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Miscellaneous Cover Sheet]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Case Opening Fee Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Case Opening Fee Due]
  • May 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Miscellaneous Pleading]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Petition (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.