U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-01452-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Flores
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Letter Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2025: [Endorsed Letter]
  • May 09, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) - Documents Sent]
  • May 05, 2025: [Bond]
  • May 05, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) - Affidavit]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arrest - Rule 5(c)(3)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.