open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00240
    Party Name:Manns v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Submitted]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to Agency]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred to Clerk]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time-Other]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent by Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice-other]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcripts - Social Security Case]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?171981
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =