open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00445
    Party Name:Gafcon, Inc. v. AECOM Caribe, LLP
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Filing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?97474
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =