open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00398
    Party Name:McCormick v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Submitted]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Self-Representation]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174137
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =