open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00129
    Party Name:Keith v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred to Clerk]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcripts - Social Security Case]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Submitted]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice-other]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174149
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =