open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00399
    Party Name:Page v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice-other]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcripts - Social Security Case]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174141
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =