open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00934
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY IN $7,400.00 IN U.S. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Non-Party]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USMS Return Executed]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service by Publication]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Warrant for Arrest]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint for Forfeiture]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?83649
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =