open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina
    Case Number:19-20060
    Party Name:Peter Matthew Mastrorio
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gray, David G. [Order on Motion of Trustee Claims Determination]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gray, David G. [Disposition of Hearing/Trial]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gray, David G. [Response]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gray, David G. [Motion of Trustee Claims Determination]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gray, David G. [Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?203059
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =