open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00131-1
    Party Name:USA v. Cruz-Aquino
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to PSI]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing ]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - Temporary]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?170333
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =