open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:20-cr-00040-1
    Party Name:USA v. Reyes-Moreno
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice-other]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
    Date Published:September 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response ]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Submitted]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss ]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release Status Report]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing ]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Brief]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Memorandum ]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - Temporary]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176872
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =