open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00146
    Party Name:MERIS v. GUILFORD COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Judge]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed IFP]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred for Screening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84964
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =