open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00145
    Party Name:ANDERSON v. ANTHONEY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Clarification]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clarification]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred for Screening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed IFP]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84963
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =