open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00051
    Party Name:Pearson v. McDonald et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral or Text-Only Order]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ncwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?99329
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =