open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:7:20-cv-00142
    Party Name:Rabo Agrifinance LLC v. Ernest Smith Farms, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Submitted]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?181420
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =