open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00654
    Party Name:ANGELL v. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Submitted]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86399
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =