open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00434
    Party Name:MedShift, LLC v. Pelle, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ncwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?101375
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =