open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

NORTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:7:20-cv-00144
    Party Name:Ramirez v. T&D Custom Fences and Decks, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred to Clerk]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice-other]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?181436
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =