U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00416-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 11, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • February 10, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • January 05, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 05, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2021: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.