U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00275-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Probation]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Request]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.