U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerrero-Tiscareno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 16, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 02, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 29, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • January 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.