U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUKOWSKI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice-Other]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • December 02, 2021: [Application for Writ by USA]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 21, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 15, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 14, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • January 12, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • January 06, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.