U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FLAHERTY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • April 21, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2021: [Early Termination of Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.