U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUSSELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice-Other]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • January 25, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • February 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • January 13, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2021: [Arrest]
  • January 07, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 07, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • January 07, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.