U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Earle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • October 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • October 18, 2021: [Seal Document]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 14, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 14, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • January 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 11, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.