U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • February 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.