U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hebert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • April 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 20, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 14, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.