U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riccaldo, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 19, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • September 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 06, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • August 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • February 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.