U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phifer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 27, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • June 21, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 13, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report - Draft]
  • July 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.