U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eckenrode
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 09, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 09, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 20, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Seal ]
  • November 09, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 21, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.