U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00413-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Best
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • May 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 17, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 17, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Seal ]
  • January 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Release Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 17, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • June 10, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • June 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Motion Referred]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • February 01, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 15, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.