U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 12, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.