U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phillips
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
  • September 02, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 17, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • January 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.