U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00459-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 10, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.