U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anthony
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2021: [Proposed Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.