U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Magana Del Toro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 26, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • March 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.