U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kershey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • July 14, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 13, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.