U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • March 03, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • February 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • June 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • May 25, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Factual Basis]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2021: [Arrest]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 25, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.